EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY (ESOPRS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ESOPRS CIO is a non-profit medical society. Aim: To advance the science & art of ophthalmic plastic & reconstructive surgery & to improve the practice & teaching of this subject in Europe & to raise sufficient funds to make fellowship grants. Note, this legal entity is newer version of the previous ESOPRS (charity number 291040) which is due for closure onceCIO bank accounts are established.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
Governance
- 02 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Colin John Vize FRCOphth | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Michael Justice Stewart | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
David Verity | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH IN EUROPE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, PUBLICATIONS AND BOTH DESIGNING AND HOLDING EXAMINATIONS; (B) PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY CARE OF PATIENTS UNDERGOING OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS THROUGH PROMOTING BEST PRACTICE; (C) PROMOTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH RELATING TO OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR PRESENTATION AND DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH AND BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR SUCH RESEARCH; (D) EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Stones
Cronks Hill
REDHILL
RH1 6NB
- Phone:
- 02075662010
- Email:
- secretary@esoprs.eu
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window