FRESH YOUTH MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One to one mentoring for young people ages 16 - 25 years old from ethnically diverse background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
258 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 July 2021: CIO registration
- FRESH YOUTH MK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Pinheiro | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
AKINOLA OMOTESHO | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Kerion Komolafe | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Folashade Komolafe | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Uzochikwa Nwuga | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | £63.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £48.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN MILTON KEYNES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION; C. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 6
3rd Floor
MARGARET POWELL HOUSE
MIDSUMMER BOULEVARD
Milton Keynes
- Phone:
- 07535624081
- Email:
- fymk@freshyouthmk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window