NATIONAL EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NEON promotes routes into, and success in, higher education by supporting organisations to work with all learners, especially those from under-represented groups and identifying, and researching, barriers to higher education and sharing potential solutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir Les Ebdon | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Toyne | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Greenfields | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Riley | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Rowley | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harder-Collins | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter John | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Hannah Merry | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING ROUTES INTO, AND SUCESS IN, HIGHER EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS TO WORK WITH ALL LEARNERS, ESPECIALLY THOSE FROM UNDER-REPRESENTED GROUPS. 2. IDENTIFYING, AND RESEARCHING, BARRIERS TO HIGHER EDUCATION, SHARING POTENTIAL SOLUTIONS AND PUBLISHING OR ENSURING THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The University of West London
St. Marys Road
LONDON
W5 5RF
- Phone:
- 02082312468
- Email:
- neon@uwl.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window