GRACE CHURCH ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity number: 1200780
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public worship and teaching ministries. Courses and events to promote the Christian faith. Community services provision such as Foodbank and parent and toddler groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £52,848
Total expenditure: £45,093

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2022: CIO registration
  • 06 September 2023: Funds received from
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • GRACE CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev STEPHEN BELL Chair 21 October 2022
ISLE OF WIGHT FOODBANK
Received: On time
James Alexander Scott Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Rev Daniel Adams Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Simon Henrick Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Anthony Matthew Hill Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Stuart Murray Linton Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Esther Bell Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Rev Oliver James Tucker Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Robert Ian Silk Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record
Paul Anthony Wade Trustee 21 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.85k
Total expenditure £45.09k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Grace Church
Marlborough Road
Ryde
Isle of Wight
PO33 1AF
Phone:
01983614717