FREEMAN EVANS ST DAVID'S DAY DENBIGH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of the poor, elderly, disabled and chronically sick residents of the former Borough of Denbigh ( i.e the town of Denbigh and the Village of Henllan)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 02 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Lisa Finn | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Collier | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Leah Roberts | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
philippa jones | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVIES | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR CHRIS MADOC-JONES | Trustee | 28 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
medwyn jones | Trustee | 27 July 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.62k | £45.20k | £34.51k | £28.16k | £353.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.71k | £39.79k | £53.24k | £41.84k | £60.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT MANCHESTER DISTRICT PROBATE OFFICE ON 5 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
THE RELEIF ASSISTANCE AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN NEED THE POOR AND CHRONICALLY SICK AND DISABLED PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF DENBIGH.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER BOROUGH OF DENBIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 PARC CLWYD
DENBIGH
LL16 4BA
- Phone:
- 01745812256
- Email:
- medwynjones@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window