ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION BANBURY BRANCH

Charity Number: 1194682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association has a clear objective: to help sustain a resilient and empowered RAF community, including serving personnel, RAF veterans and their families. We work to reduce loneliness and isolation by helping all generations to remain active, thriving and valued members of their local communities. We relieve key elements of everyday life which can cause our beneficiaries pressure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,077
Total expenditure: £3,985

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Mark Adams Chair 12 May 2021
None on record
Cheryl Perry Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Steve Bennett Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Christopher Howard Smithson Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Ricky John Hills Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Andrew McHugh Trustee 31 March 2021
MILL ARTS CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
TOOLEY'S BOATYARD TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.00k £5.99k £3.45k £2.08k
Total expenditure £5.27k £4.02k £4.65k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2024 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46A Broad Street
Banbury
OX16 5BX
Phone:
01295250941