THE ASSOCIATION OF APPLIED BIOLOGISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises conferences and supports publications to support those working in the area of applied biology and to promote advances in the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2021: CIO registration
- 19 May 2022: Funds received from 275655 THE ASSOCIATION OF APPLIED BIOLOGISTS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CHARLOTTE WHITE F App Biol | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Martin Parry | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dale Sanders | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Steven Edgington | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nigel Halford | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guy Cameron Barker | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Edwards | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Iain Simon Donnison | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Nicola Spence | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £343.93k | £459.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £447.57k | £394.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND ADVANCEMENT OF ALL BRANCHES OF BIOLOGY AND, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING), TO FOSTER THE PRACTICE, GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, WITH A FOCUS ON THE APPLICATION OF BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES IN THE PRODUCTION AND PRESERVATION OF FOOD, FIBRE AND OTHER MATERIALS AND FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE EARTH'S PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASSOCIATION OF APPLIED BIOLOGISTS
WARWICK ENTERPRISE PARK
WELLESBOURNE
WARWICKSHIRE
CV35 9EF
- Phone:
- 07411967414
- Email:
- geraint@aab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window