Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHOIRS AND MUSIC MOSELEY

Charity number: 518079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £542 £597 £2.36k £2.48k £3.50k
Total expenditure £852 £633 £1.52k £1.96k £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A