NATIONAL TRAILS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National Trails UK will deliver its charitable objects through advocacy, liaising with government and working with relevant departments on long-term policy and strategy for the National Trails. It will actively raise funds in support of its objectives, enabling information exchange and learning opportunities for members and will market and promote the National Trails for the benefit of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£614,229
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £614.23k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£409,573
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £409.57k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £579,515 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £409.57k | |
Retained for future use | £204.66k |
People

3 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Gattiker | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wang | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Jane Phillipa Morgan | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shane Robert Logan | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katy Rebecca Owen | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Taryn Jane Nixon | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Scott Clark | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Michael Twomey | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Roger Kearey | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Julian Martin Gray | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.00k | £614.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.11k | £409.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £160.00k | £579.52k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £614.23k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £409.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £9.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £8.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £564.76k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £203.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (1) PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THE PUBLIC BY SECURING THE PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT AND CONSERVATION OF THE VARIOUS NATIONAL TRAILS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ('THE NATIONAL TRAILS'), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE NATIONAL TRAILS AND ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO WALK, RIDE AND TAKE EXERCISE USING THE NATIONAL TRAILS AND TO ACCESS AND ENJOY THE LANDSCAPES THROUGH WHICH THEY PASS; (2) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE NATIONAL TRAILS, THEIR HISTORY AND HERITAGE, THE COMMUNITIES LINKED WITH THEM AND THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS IN WHICH THEY ARE SITUATED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ARTS AND HERITAGE ENGAGEMENT ACTIVITIES; AND (3) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN, THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WHERE THIS RELATES TO THE NETWORK OF NATIONAL TRAILS AND THE LANDSCAPES THROUGH WHICH THEY RUN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Trails UK
c/o Unit 11
Residence 2
Royal William Yard
- Phone:
- 07828 647659
- Email:
- info@nationaltrails.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window