OLDHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1194708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious functions in the manner of the Methodist Church. Worship, service, mission and pastoral care

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2021: Standard registration
  • 14 December 2022: Funds received from 1138084 SHAW AND ROYTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
  • 19 July 2024: Funds received from 1134364 THE METHODIST CHURCH - OLDHAM AND SADDLEWORTH CIRC...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE METHODIST CHURCH IN OLDHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

36 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Williams Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
John Paul Wilkinson Trustee 01 September 2023
SOUTH CHADDERTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Pamela Ruth Walker Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Angleena Julie Keizer Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Kennedy Gondongwe Trustee 01 September 2022
SOUTH CHADDERTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MARGARET TAYLOR Trustee 05 July 2021
THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF OLDHAM BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
Kathryn Heathcote Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Glennis Kirkwood Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
June Mills Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
DOROTHY ROBERTS Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Edwin Winterbottom Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Susan Jane Nuttall Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
ROBERT MATTHEW ASHTON Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Rev Robert Davies Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Stephen Keith Foster Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
DOROTHY THORPE Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
GRAHAM RADCLIFFE Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Rev Suva Lianne Catford Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Stephen Paul Titmuss Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
James William Upton Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
GORDON JAMES ROSCOE Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Ruth Michelle Radcliffe Trustee 05 July 2021
SOUTH CHADDERTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Leslie Perry Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Michael Wilson Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
DENNIS HEYES Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Norman James Unsworth Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
MALCOLM HARRY MILWAIN Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
MOIRA ELIZABETH BERGIN Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
David Ian Crossley Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Rev Kenneth George McNally Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Carol Stopford Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Barbara Howard Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Nigel John Bacon Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Judith Ann McArdle Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
Janet Mitchell Trustee 05 July 2021
None on record
JANET ABBOTT Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £529.36k £612.55k
Total expenditure £403.28k £675.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £830 £67
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £43.20k £13.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.40k £328.31k
Income - Other £482.93k £270.57k
Income - Legacies £830 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £403.28k £675.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £24.47k £23.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £41.29k £12.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £2.26m £1.87m
Long-term investments £265.55k £203.06k
Other assets £637.19k £573.52k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0
Total liabilities £12.54k £13.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 BANNACH DRIVE
CHADDERTON
OLDHAM
OL9 0QN
Phone:
01616788704