THE WEST HACKNEY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The upkeep of the almshouse premises, namely West Hackney House, 15 Northwold Road, London, N16, and thereafter to apply the income of the Charity for the benefit of the almspeople of the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hackney
Governance
- 16 July 2021: CIO registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 214088 THE WEST HACKNEY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andre Beryl Crump | Chair | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
IRFAN SIDDIK MALIK | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Kakai | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
MARGARET LOUISE GINEVRA BEAVEN | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Andrew Murphy | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Esther Davis | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lewis Innis | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.22k | £91.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.40k | £69.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
(1) the provision and maintenance of social housing in the form of almshouse accommodation for persons who are in need, hardship or distress who have resided in the area of West Hackney within the London Borough of Hackney for not less than five years prior to appointment SAVE THAT if there is a vacancy and there is no applicant who is qualified as aforesaid the charity trustees may appoint a person who is in need, hardship or distress who has resided in the London Borough of Hackney for not less than five years prior to appointment; and (2) such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) for the benefit of residents appointed by the CIO as the charity trustees from time to time see fit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARRISON HOUSING
42-46 ST. JAMES'S GARDENS
LONDON
W11 4RQ
- Phone:
- 02076034332
- Website:
-
harrisonhousing.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window