THE MAGNA CARTA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Magna Carta Trust works to educate the public, especially young people, about the history and contemporary relevance of Magna Carta. It demonstrates Magna Carta as one of the most important British exports through links with those organisations and institutions that promote Magna Carta values in the UK and internationally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER SINCLAIR | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Lewis L Neilsen Jr | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Charlesworth | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Edward Horton | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paula Redway | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Robert Edgar Double | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
(I) TO PRESERVE AND ENHANCE FOR PUBLIC USE THE SITES AND RESOURCES ASSOCIATED WITH MAGNA CARTA (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF MAGNA CARTA IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE ROLE AND IMPACT OF MAGNA CARTA AND ITS HISTORY AND CONTEMPORARY RELEVANCE TO THE RULE OF LAW, HUMAN RIGHTS, DEMOCRARY AND ACCESS TO JUSTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
City of London Corporation
Guildhall
Aldermanbury
EC2V 7HH
- Phone:
- 07879632870
- Email:
- mark@magnacartatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window