THE ABSTRACT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
N.B. We are not currently accepting unsolicited requests for funding. The Abstract Foundation makes grants to organisations and individuals, with a particular focus on projects which support young people and help them to improve their opportunities and quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Lewis Glatman | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Miles | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHANNA LOUISE ROPNER | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33m | £329.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02m | £520.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.33m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.02m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.00m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 3.1.1. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR ORGANISATIONS THAT SUPPORT SUCH PEOPLE; AND 3.1.2. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3.2. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Rose & Crown Yard
LONDON
SW1Y 6RE
- Phone:
- 02077478272
- Email:
- info@abstractfoundation.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window