THE FRIENDS OF THAME HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objects of the Charity are: to encourage, foster and maintain the interests of the public in the Community Hospital in Thame; to provide personal service for and on behalf of patients of this hospital; to provide for patients and staff, amenities and comforts not provided by the National Health Service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 June 2021: CIO registration
- 23 December 2024: Funds received from 246136 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THAME HOSPITAL
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE TAYLOR | Chair | 11 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Graham Neale Orriss | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Anne Parry | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Chaplin | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
KEITH GREEN | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Kenneth William Burch | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Henry George Ovens | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THAME COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND OTHER SERVICE USERS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thame Community Hospital
East Street
THAME
OX9 3JT
- Phone:
- 01844212727
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window