REBEL RESTORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rebel Restoration provides grants and funding to holistic projects which : 1. Remove carbon from the atmosphere whilst restoring natural habitats and biodiversity 2. Develop research on the impact of nature-based carbon removal and 3. Encourage communities to become involved in nature-based projects. Preferably all three. Mostly in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Gareth Woodfine | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morven Elizabeth Robertson | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rose Williamson | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ciaran James Nelson | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ALAN BATES | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £152.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £41.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING: A: PROJECTS FOCUSED ON REMOVING CARBON FROM THE ATMOSPHERE AND RESTORING NATURAL HABITATS; B: RESEARCH INTO PROJECTS ON THE IMPACT OF NATURE-BASED CARBON REMOVAL AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND C: RAISING AWARENESS OF THE IMPACT OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND ENCOURAGING COMMUNITIES TO BECOME INVOLVED IN NATURE-BASED PROJECTS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
10 QUEEN STREET PLACE
LONDON
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 03308084303
- Email:
- claire@rebelrestoration.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window