Accounts and annual returns ST FEOCK COMMUNITY TRANSPORT CIO

Charity number: 1194975
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 07 May 2025 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 August 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 378 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 June 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 744 days