SERVING HUMANITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITABLE PROJECTS TO MEET LOCAL NEEDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
- Malawi
- Pakistan
Governance
- 20 October 2021: CIO registration
- SERVING HUMANITY (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheik Irfan Khudurun | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Smeeta Ali | Trustee | 22 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Feroza Natha | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aazaan Khan | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED LATIF ABDULLAH DESAI | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ARSHAD KHAN | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ZULFIKAR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
FOZIA KOUSER RAMZAN | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.73k | £190.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.15k | £193.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE, THE HOMELESS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC WORSHIP AND EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON).
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 ELSTREE GARDENS
ILFORD
IG1 2QQ
- Phone:
- 07971124862
- Email:
- comms@servinghumanity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window