THE LACE GUILD CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Lace Guild CIO educates the public in the craft of lacemaking, its history and use, and through education encourages design, development and professional presentation of lace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 August 2021: CIO registration
- 24 July 2023: Funds received from 274397 THE LACE GUILD
- THE LACE GUILD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Lorna Smith | Chair | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Claire Lonsdale | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Jetem Bryan Obaji | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Hopper-Bishop | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Samantha Foulon | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lee Evans | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Binns | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Muncey | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tessa June Whitlock | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Norman Baldwin | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.88k | £323.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.19k | £164.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT OF LACEMAKING, ITS HISTORY AND ITS USE. 2. TO PROMOTE A HIGH STANDARD OF LACEMAKING. 3. THROUGH EDUCATION, TO ENCOURAGE DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT AND PROFESSIONAL PRESENTATION OF LACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LACE GUILD
53
AUDNAM
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 4AE
- Phone:
- 01384390739
- Email:
- hollies@laceguild.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window