WAKEFIELD HOSPICE

Charity number: 518392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of the highest level of symptom management and care for people who have advanced active, progressive and life threatening illness., through the provision of a Specialist Palliative Care Team. The Hospice endorses a holistic approach in promoting quality of life for patients as well as providing the continuing support that is offered to families and carers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 1988: Standard registration
  • 06 March 2019: Funds received from 328122 EDDIE LEWIS TRUST
  • 10 August 2022: Funds received from 1153642 THE NEW FITZWILLIAM AND KINSLEY OLD FOLKS TREAT FU...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Angela Fawcett Trustee 28 January 2025
None on record
Faris Dean Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Dr Saadia Hayat Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Sarah Charlotte Black Trustee 12 August 2024
None on record
Dr Barbara Crosse Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
John William Knox Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
Jo-Anne Charalambous Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Perminderjeet Kaur Banwait Trustee 03 April 2023
THE BANWAIT FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Claire Kendall Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT BECK Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
JOHN GORDON MILNE Trustee 01 February 2021
BRIDGE2AID
Received: On time
Robert James Otter Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
Alan Thomas Hamilton Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
Helen Jane Hirst Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Navkirnjot Bains-Williams Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.57m £5.45m £4.26m £4.55m £5.20m
Total expenditure £4.45m £4.34m £4.40m £5.07m £5.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.08m £979.66k £1.19m £1.53m £1.37m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.76m £2.21m £1.29m £1.18m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £1.46m £910.75k £1.46m £1.67m £1.89m
Income - Charitable activities £1.26m £2.01m £1.44m £1.66m £1.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £88.20k £58.79k £36.57k £49.60k £94.73k
Income - Other £0 £251.87k £31.70k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.04m £389.79k £566.12k £585.05k £1.00m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.98m £3.12m £2.94m £3.20m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.47m £1.22m £1.45m £1.86m £2.13m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £11.00k £33.35k £24.99k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £15.49k £11.54k £10.07k £9.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.77m £2.80m £2.71m £2.78m £3.17m
Long-term investments £1.20m £1.12m £984.12k £867.58k £462.42k
Other assets £2.54m £4.06m £3.05m £2.85m £2.44m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.24m £1.48m £361.91k £574.81k £456.35k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WAKEFIELD HOSPICE
ABERFORD ROAD
WAKEFIELD
WF1 4TS
Phone:
01924331400