CUMBRIA FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage the public study of British family history, genealogy, heraldry and local history with particular reference to Cumbria; to promote the preservation, security and accessibility of archival material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 January 1987: Standard registration
- CUMBRIA FHS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR THOMAS LITTLETON | Chair | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor Arnold Lewis | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Heppell | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bishop | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM BUNDRED | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.36k | £19.31k | £27.72k | £28.52k | £29.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.30k | £10.59k | £18.71k | £23.38k | £60.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 1979 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 1984 AS AMENDED ON 10 DEC 1986 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC STUDY OF BRITISH FAMILY HISTORY, GENEALOGY, HENALDRY AND LOCAL HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO CUMBRIA. B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, SECURITY AND ACCESSIBILITY OF ARCHIVAL MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Ainderby Gardens
NORTHALLERTON
North Yorkshire
DL7 8GU
- Phone:
- 07584055099
- Email:
- secretary@cumbriafhs.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window