THE GRIMSHAW ARTS AND ARCHITECTURE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity creates educational programmes as part of the school curriculum within schools and at the Grimshaw studio which range from Big Build Days and workshops, to interactive careers events. All of the workshops and educational programmes are also available as online teaching resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 16 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nicholas Thomas Grimshaw PPRA | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Anne Lees | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Franklyn | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Cortese | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan George Snow | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LADY ALEXANDRINE LAVINIA SABRINA GRIMSHAW | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||
JEREMY JAMES DE CARTERET TATE | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew David Whalley | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 June 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 June 2024 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN WHETHER IN THE UK OR ABROAD BY: 3.1.1. THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN IN THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT; 3.1.2. RAISING AWARENESS AND APPRECIATION OF THE IMPORTANCE OF HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN IN THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT; AND 3.1.3. RAISING AWARENESS AND APPRECIATION OF THE IMPORTANCE OF THE USE OF SUSTAINABLE MATERIALS AND METHODS IN ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN IN ORDER TO MAXIMISE POSITIVE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACTS. 3.2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF ARCHITECTURE, DESIGN AND THE ARTS, WHETHER IN THE UK OR ABROAD, AND IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.1. AWARDING GRANTS BURSARIES AND STIPENDS TO INDIVIDUALS OF ALL AGES, IN PARTICULAR SCHOOL LEAVERS, WHO WISH TO EXPLORE THROUGH WORK EXPERIENCE OR INTERNSHIPS ARCHITECTURE, DESIGN OR THE ARTS AS A CAREER BEFORE COMMITTING THEMSELVES TO VOCATIONAL COURSES; 3.2.2. AWARDING TO PERSONS OF ALL AGES SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION, WHERE THE PERSON'S STUDIES RELATE TO THE AREAS OF ARCHITECTURE, DESIGN OR THE ARTS; 3.2.3. SPONSORSHIP OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING PUBLIC LECTURES WITH THE AIM OF EDUCATING THE PUBLIC (OF ALL AGES) OR A SUFFICIENT SECTION THEREOF IN ARCHITECTURE, DESIGN OR THE ARTS; 3.2.4. PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO ARCHITECTURE AND DESIGN, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH MUST BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 3.5 NOTHING IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITEMOOR DAVIS LTD
5TH FLOOR
111 CHARTERHOUSE STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6AW
- Phone:
- 02072518311
- Email:
- Roy@whitemoordavis.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window