PENINSULA MOUNTAIN AND CAVE RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PenMaCRA coordinates and provides training, equipment and facilities to members of Mountain Rescue England and Wales ("MR") operating in the South West of England and acts as the forum for operational standards in association with MR and statutory emergency services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 December 2021: CIO registration
- PENMACRA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paula Holbrook | Chair | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lee Goudzwaard | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Roger King | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Paul Frederick Hudson MBE | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Zachary Harvey-Brewer | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £983 | £950 | |
|
Total expenditure | £980 | £996 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF THOSE ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENT OR NATURAL HAZARD, TO PROVIDE AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, COORDINATE ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS, SUPPORT FOR THE ACTIVITIES OF THE VOLUNTARY SEARCH AND RESCUE SERVICES PROVIDED BY ITS MEMBERS AND TO ACT AS THE REGIONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO MOUNTAIN RESCUE (ENGLAND AND WALES) (“MR”) FOR MR TEAMS IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Dartmoor SRT
Unit 3
Hameldown Road
Exeter Road Industrial Estate
OKEHAMPTON
EX20 1UB
- Phone:
- 07800504002
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window