THE SUSSEX GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in Sussex in accordance with the charity's Statement of Beliefs. To establish a partnership of Bible-centred churches in Sussex, working together to train Christian leaders, strengthen and plant churches and advance the gospel of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 January 2022: CIO registration
- 26 April 2023: Funds received from 1121873 THE SUSSEX GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Samuel Nicholas Cato Carter | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Russell Knowles | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger James Barden | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Thrift | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rory Malise Graham | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
REVD JONATHAN NOEL ALAN HOBBS | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.60k | £116.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.11k | £104.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUSSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY ESTABLISHING A PARTNERSHIP OF BIBLE-CENTRED CHURCHES IN SUSSEX WORKING TOGETHER TO TRAIN CHRISTIAN LEADERS TO STRENGTHEN AND PLANT CHURCHES AND TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Wilderness
Lindfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 2JD
- Phone:
- 07516 672 848
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window