JERWOOD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation owns the Jerwood Collection of 20th & 21st century British art, which is available for display in the public domain. We are part of a family of philanthropic organisations and welcome applications for funding for capital and revenue support for visual and performing arts in the UK, particularly with a focus on working with our Collection and making art available for public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2022: Standard registration
- 28 November 2024: Funds received from 1074036 JERWOOD CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert David Tyler | Chair | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucy Amanda Ash | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Thompson-Schwab | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William King | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Wharton | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE GOODISON | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA VICTORIA CAMPBELL | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
TARA LOUISE MAYHEW | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GRIEVE CBE | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lara Wardle | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.14m | £449.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £659.39k | £349.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £33.78m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £358.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £101 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £584.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £75.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.42k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £423.52k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £75.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF ART INCLUDING BY MAKING ART AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES AND OTHER SUCH BUILDINGS OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL AGREE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 186
Ludlow
SY8 9DX
- Phone:
- 01584823413
- Email:
- jerwood@jerwood.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window