BELZ CHEIDER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING AND FUNDING ANY SCHOOL OR EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH INCLUDING PROVIDING MEALS AND INCLUDING ASSISTANCE WITH TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM THESE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE TEMPORARILY HOUSEBOUND OR WHO FOR WHATEVER REASON ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE MEALS FOR THEMSELVES BY PROVIDING KOSHER MEALS FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PINCHOS ENGLANDER | Chair | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Joseph Paneth | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Chaim Bard | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH FOR ORTHODOX JEWS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES IN PARTICULAR BY: • SUPPORTING AND FUNDING ANY SCHOOL OR EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH INCLUDING PROVIDING MEALS AND INCLUDING ASSISTANCE WITH TRANSPORTATION TO AND FROM THESE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS • FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE TEMPORARILY HOUSEBOUND OR WHO FOR WHATEVER REASON ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE MEALS FOR THEMSELVES BY PROVIDING KOSHER MEALS FOR SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 LEWESTON PLACE
LONDON
N16 6RH
- Phone:
- 07469305575
- Email:
- belzcheider21@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window