NEW CHAPTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Chapters, based in Warwickshire, will provide a much-needed home for individuals who want to recover from drug and alcohol dependency. New Chapters will offer charity beds to those who would otherwise be unable to access private rehabilitation centres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Rutherford | Chair | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Cuningham Selby | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Over | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY SNOAD | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne McKinnon | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN CHILVERS | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.91k | £68.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £947 | £29.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; NEW CHAPTERS SUPPORTS THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PEOPLE EXPERIENCING DRUG, ALCOHOL OR OTHER ADDICTIONS IN THE COVENTRY, WARWICKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL SUPPORT, THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES, AND TRAINING TO ADDRESS THE BARRIERS PRESENTED THROUGH ADDICTION AND OTHER LIFE CHALLENGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 THE CLOSE
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 2BL
- Phone:
- 07814218338
- Website:
-
WWW.NEWCHAPTERS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window