SHREWSBURY MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preventing, particularly but not exclusively, men aged 18 or over, within Shrewsbury and the surrounding area, from becoming socially excluded, and assisting them in the provision of facilities in which they can jointly or individually undertake creative, physical, or recreational activities, learn or pass on skills and knowledge and support each other socially.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 16 November 2021: CIO registration
- 17 February 2025: Funds received from 1110476 NORTH SHREWSBURY FRIENDLY NEIGHBOURS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Rouse | Chair | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Glynn Anthony Dixon | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katey Ann Evans | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Merlin John Thomas | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arran George McLachlan | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Smith BA Msc | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.68k | £25.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £10.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN SHREWSBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHROPSHIRE & WEST MID SHOWGROUND
BERWICK ROAD
SHREWSBURY
SY1 2PF
- Phone:
- 01743357901
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window