LONG MELFORD HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and maintain a Museum and Heritage Centre in the annexe of the Long Melford Memorial Village Hall, for the purpose of acquiring, preserving and displaying items of interest relating to Long Melford and its environs. In addition we undertake and promote archival and archaeological research, the results of which will be published for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 October 2021: Standard registration
- LONG MELFORD HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr JOHN MICHAEL NUNN | Chair | 23 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Kenneth George Dodd | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD MICHETTE | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
David John Burch | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Anne Haywood Macleish | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Elizabeth Ada Russell BSc | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Erica Symonds BA, PGCE | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David William Gevaux MA | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.95k | £3.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.28k | £2.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LONG MELFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: (A) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM AND HERITAGE CENTRE TO ACQUIRE, PRESERVE, AND DISPLAY ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST RELATING T0 LONG MELFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS; (B) UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF LONG MELFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Limes
Long Melford
Suffolk
co10 9sx
- Phone:
- 07792357039
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window