WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds to support the research, preparation and writing of the Victoria County History of Wiltshire. It raises funds by seeking donations and organising fund-raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 December 2021: CIO registration
- 07 February 2024: Funds received from 1102882 WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Moss | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Ally McConnell | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anabel Loyd | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Thorn | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Bill Perry | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jeremy Hodges | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Holden | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John d'Arcy | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Caswill | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tean Dallaway | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Stone | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANITA ADDINGTON | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Gillian Marjorie Alder | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MELISSA ANN BARNETT | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Wright | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.58k | £24.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.10k | £18.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF WILTSHIRE (INCLUDING THE BOROUGH OF SWINDON) BY RESEARCHING FOR, PREPARING AND WRITING THE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY OF WILTSHIRE, AND TO RAISE AND APPLY THE MONIES AND COMMISSION THE RESEARCH NECESSARY TO ACHIEVE THAT PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ST. MARGARETS STREET
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 1DE
- Phone:
- 01225863946
- Email:
- info@wiltshirehistory.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window