EALING ANCHOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Parents and Carers of Children with Disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £41,913 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 28 October 2021: CIO registration
- 07 February 2022: Funds received from 1042054 PARENTS OF EALING SELF-HELP TRAINING SCHEME
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aisha Tabani Chowdhry | Chair | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rexon | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shadaan Tabani | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Kauffman | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beckie Shuttleworth | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Nadiya Shvets | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATERINA PUPOVIC | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.36k | £118.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.56k | £105.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.22k | £41.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AGED 0-5 YEARS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING WHO HAVE A DISABILITY, ADDITIONAL NEED OR COMPLEX MEDICAL NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR PARENTS OF SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN AGED 0-5 YEARS. B) BEING A SOURCE OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR PARENTS ON HOW TO HELP THEIR CHILD'S DEVELOPMENT. C) PROVIDING A STIMULATING PLAY ENVIRONMENT WITH CAREFULLY STRUCTURED ACTIVITIES ACCORDING TO EACH CHILD'S NEEDS AND STAGE OF DEVELOPMENT AND PROVIDE SOCIAL OPPORTUNITIES TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windmill Childrens Centre
135 Windmill Lane
GREENFORD
UB6 9DZ
- Phone:
- 02085719954
- Email:
- info@ealinganchor.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window