THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY AND ST JUDE, HALIFAX.

Charity number: 1196775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £200,307
Total expenditure: £184,273

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY AND ST JUDE PCC, HALIFAX (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stuart Malcolm Stobart Chair 01 April 2021
THE GOODALL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
ZEPHANIAH MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Sarah Louise Long Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Audrey Lilian Heap Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
Sarah Michelle Mitchell Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
William David Kneebone Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Sarah Rebecca Hill Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Felicity Jayne Hales Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Julie Ann Hudson Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Margaret Lillian Medhurst Trustee 20 March 2022
None on record
Rev Martin William Parrott Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Angela Greenwood Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Darrell Hudson Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Elaine Kidd Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Mark Young Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Nicholas Page Trustee 21 April 2019
THE GOODALL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Dr Hilary Megan Felton Trustee 01 October 2006
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £111.79k £200.70k £200.31k
Total expenditure £87.51k £108.53k £184.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 SAVILE ROAD
HALIFAX
HX1 2BA
Phone:
07771778026