Trustees ROSETREES
Charity number: 1197546

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Lomas | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shana Vijayan | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Livermore | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Jamaria Kong | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Edwards | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Caine | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Stewart | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Ross | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEE ROBERT MESNICK | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Katz | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Alison Mitchell | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Jane Fox | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.