THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MONICA'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health and wellbeing in the Easingwold district and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 December 2021: CIO registration
- 04 April 2022: Funds received from 513694 LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MONICA'S HOSPITAL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Kenworthy | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Wilkinson | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bussey Mrs | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Fordham | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terry Saeedi | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorraine Boyd | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Pratt | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Berry | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Jackson | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wintermeyer | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Clarke | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek McLuckie | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Rhodes | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.81k | £32.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.35k | £56.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2021 as amended on 08 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN THE EASINGWOLD DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY: 1. PROMOTING, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING THE BETTERMENT OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES AT ST MONICA’S HOSPITAL, EASINGWOLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR ITS PATIENTS AND OTHER USERS; 2. PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT TO SUPPORT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF MEMBERS OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Monica's Hospital
Long Street
Easingwold
York
YO61 3JD
- Phone:
- 07985 255869
- Email:
- friends@fosmh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window