MAY MEASUREMENT MONTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of MMM are to: Raise awareness of health issues surrounding high BP and emphasize the importance of regular blood pressure measurement Encourage and facilitate opportunistic BP screenings in local communities Support research and advocacy efforts to improve global hypertension management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Angola
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Ethiopia
- France
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR NEIL REGINALD POULTER | Chair | 09 November 2021 |
|
|||||
David Somen | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Aletta Elisabeth Schutte | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Beaney | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Georgios Stergiou | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARKUS PETER SCHLAICH | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £413.07k | £348.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.88k | £210.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY: (1) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES SURROUNDING RAISED AND HIGH BLOOD PRESSURE INCLUDING CAUSES, PREVENTION, AND MANAGEMENT; (2) UNDERTAKING AN ANNUAL GLOBAL SCREENING PROGRAMME FOR THE PUBLIC, AND PROVIDING THOSE SCREENED WITH ADVICE OR DIRECT TO THEM TO FURTHER MEDICAL ADVICE AS APPROPRIATE; AND (3) THE COLLECTION OF THE SCIENTIFIC EVIDENCE NEEDED TO HELP INFLUENCE GLOBAL HEALTH POLICY AND MAKE BP SCREENING MORE WIDELY AVAILABLE AROUND THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07961356715
- Email:
- info@maymeasure.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window