THE BURY ST EDMUNDS SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bury Society is open to everyone who cares about Bury St Edmund's past, present and future. Our aim is to ensure that the town continues to grow and prosper whilst remaining a beautiful place to live, work or visit. Our objectives are to foster its heritage and character, encourage a balance of old and new and to inform and engage communities on matters that impact our local environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN TAYLOR | Chair | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Michael Thuell | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Keith Willoughby Booth | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Anthony Saloway-Cooke | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hughes | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gary Moody | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence John O'DONOGHUE | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CHUNG | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||
RUSSELL COOK | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Nigel Richmond BURNETT | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE NUNN | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.29k | £80.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.46k | £91.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.20k | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BURY ST. EDMUNDS WHICH SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT': 1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, CULTURE AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OR AREAS OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING THROUGH GRANT-MAKING. 4. TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH DIRECTLY PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Risbygate Centre
90 Risbygate Street
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP33 3AA
- Phone:
- 07766 072 566
- Email:
- treasurer@burysociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window