THE ORDERS AND MEDALS RESEARCH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) assisting members and general public in their research b) actively encouraging and publishing to the general public the results of individual research c) arranging lectures and meetings for the benefit of the benefit of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
87 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 July 2022: CIO registration
- OMRS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mann | Chair | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Brooks | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Paul Brewster | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Trigger | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Thomas | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Pitchfork | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Grist | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Emsley | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN TOOHEY | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.44k | £51.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.37k | £46.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ORDERS, DECORATIONS AND MEDALS AND ALL MATTERS RELATED THERETO, DEDICATED TO THE MEMORY AND HONOUR OF THE ORIGINAL RECIPIENTS, BY: A) ASSISTING MEMBERS AND GENERAL PUBLIC IN THEIR RESEARCH B) ACTIVELY ENCOURAGING AND PUBLISHING TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE RESULTS OF INDIVIDUAL RESEARCH C) ARRANGING LECTURES AND MEETINGS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND D) BY ANY OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
OMRS
71-75 Shelton Street
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 01932229281
- Email:
- generalsecretary@omrs.org
- Website:
-
omrs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window