NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DOWN'S SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of the needs of people with Down's Syndrome, their families and carers, for public benefit, in particular, but not exclusively by providing information, advice, support, and educational, vocational, social, cultural and sporting opportunities and by raising awareness of Down's Syndrome within Nottinghamshire, in order to maximise opportunities for their participation and inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 March 2022: CIO registration
- NDSSG (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Louise Pastore | Chair | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Louise Ackroyd | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Louise Stanko | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Marie Limer | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aisling McKay | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Sylvia Rutherford | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillippa Jane Dunham | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Marder | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Aimee Prior | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neil Coppins | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Howard | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.01k | £40.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42k | £27.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SUCH PEOPLE WITH INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT, AND EDUCATIONAL, VOCATIONAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND SPORTING OPPORTUNITIES AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF DOWN'S SYNDROME WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, IN ORDER TO MAXIMISE THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR, AND PARTICIPATION AND INCLUSION OF, SUCH PEOPLE INTO SOCIETY WITHIN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Woolmer Road
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG2 2FB
- Phone:
- 07743862035
- Email:
- info@ndssg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window