SEYMOUR FIELDHOUSE HOMES CIO

Charity number: 1196715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of housing for the needy of the parishes of Henley in Arden, Ullenhall and Wootton Wawen

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,032
Total expenditure: £11,458

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAN BUCKNALL Trustee 16 May 2022
THE ULLENHALL CHAPEL LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF FRANCIS, LORD CARRINGTON IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WOOTTON WAWEN
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
NORMAN GASCOIGNE Trustee 16 May 2022
EDGBASTON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PETER ROSS CORNFORD Trustee 16 May 2022
THE ULLENHALL CHAPEL LANDS AND OTHER CHARITIES
Received: On time
Marijana Cornforth Bainbridge Trustee 16 May 2022
HENLEY-IN-ARDEN WAR MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOWARD AND JOYCE FIELD CHARITABLE MEMORIAL TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Michael David Cooney Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Susan Ann Norman Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.23k £23.28k £36.03k
Total expenditure £22.02k £51.52k £11.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 March 2023 135 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 9TH AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 APR 2018
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO WERE BORN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR HAVE RESIDED THERE FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OR APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HENLEY-IN-ARDEN, ULLENHALL, AND WOOTON WAWEN
Registration history
  • 05 February 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
74 High Street
Henley-in-Arden
Warwickshire
B95 5BX
Phone:
01564794343
Website:

No information available