SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE ADVICE/ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL/EDUCATIONAL & OTHER ACTIVITIES TO: A) HELP YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS/CAPACITIES & CAPABILITIES ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT/MATURE/RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, BUILD THEIR SELF ESTEEM; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL/LEISURE ACTIVITY IN INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,419 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 January 2022: CIO registration
- SYEP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Hagan Palmer | Chair | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Timothy Gardiner | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Julia Everson | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Shayne Stork | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Karen Vincent | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Martin Callam | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sarah Vincent | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Judith Leggett | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Simon Stokes | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||
KEITH HIDER | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.17k | £193.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.03k | £176.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.13k | £25.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS LIVING IN SPROWSTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND TO BUILD THEIR SELF ESTEEM; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Recreation Ground
Church Street
Old Catton
Norwich
Norfolk
- Phone:
- 01603423880
- Email:
- syep.treasurer@syep.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window