THE SOUTHERN EARLY MUSIC FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the study, practice and appreciation of the art and science of music, and in particular of 'Early Music', eg by organising workshops, lectures, courses etc, both live and online, and by disseminating information relating to early music to SEMF members and others. SEMF is one of 9 UK regional Early Music Fora; our main area of operation is the south and south east of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Kent
- Medway
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 February 2022: Standard registration
- SOUTHERN EARLY MUSIC FORUM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Ann Stewart | Chair | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Gibbard | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Sharples | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Holmes Pegler | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Irene Gascoine | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY ROSE KNIGHT | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY CLAIRE SHARPLES | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID JAMES SHAW | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Frost | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Doreen van Seenus | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Thomas Keeler | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES SAMUELSON | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.11k | £8.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £7.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Kent Road
Halling
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 1AT
- Phone:
- 01634 241986
- Email:
- secretary@semf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window