YORK AND DISTRICT GUILD OF WEAVERS, SPINNERS AND DYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold regular meetings on the third Saturday in the month with the exception of December. Some meetings have a business section followed by a talk or demonstration given by a visiting textile artist. Other meetings are used to practice and share our skills. We also demonstrate our crafts at local events and shows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 July 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Butt | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Barnes | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
BERYL THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.97k | £2.67k | £6.24k | £8.51k | £15.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.67k | £1.94k | £3.78k | £8.43k | £14.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 16 JANUARY 1988, 20 JANUARY 1990, 20 MARCH 1999,17 MARCH 2007 AND 21 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO PRESERVE AND TO PROMOTE THE TRADITIONAL CRAFTS OF HAND WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AFORESAID CRAFTS AND IN ALLIED TEXTILE CRAFTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
5 Park View
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG1 5LY
- Phone:
- 07810347037
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window