THE CHRIS SMITH MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide grants to support participation in running and related sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EUAN JOHN MICHAEL CAMERON SPENCE | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Clare Mary Thelma Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE CAROLINE SMITH | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIANNA NATASHA MILLIGAN | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ISABEL REBECCA SPENCE | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BENJAMIN SMITH | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £11.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.49k | £18.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE A) BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PARTICIPATION IN RUNNING AND OTHER SUCH SPORTS AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY B) PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY TO IMPROVE FITNESS AND HEALTH AND TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES IN ORDER TO GROW AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ruthven Lodge
London Road
Cuckfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH17 5EU
- Phone:
- 077864163132
- Email:
- info@csmf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window