NIDDERDALE MUSEUM SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO was formed to take over the work of Nidderdale Museum Society (regd charity 532339) with effect from 1st April 2022. Its object is to advance the education of the public by maintaining a museum to preserve and share the heritage of the Nidderdale area by collecting, conserving and exhibiting items of archaeological, historical, industrial, educational and community interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,480 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 December 2021: CIO registration
- 21 November 2022: Funds received from 532339 NIDDERDALE MUSEUM SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Turley | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Forsyth | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roseanne Hicks | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hayton | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeannie Heather Andrew | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Anne Mauricette Hintze | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Simpson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Welch | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Charles Viccars Andrew | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.18k | £35.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.61k | £37.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.92k | £5.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CIO’S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MAINTAINING A MUSEUM TO PRESERVE AND SHARE THE HERITAGE OF THE NIDDERDALE AREA BY COLLECTING, CONSERVING AND EXHIBITING ITEMS OF ARCHAEOLOGICAL, HISTORICAL, INDUSTRIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND COMMUNITY INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD WORKHOUSE
KING STREET
PATELEY BRIDGE
HARROGATE
HG3 5LE
- Phone:
- 01423711225
- Email:
- info@nidderdalemuseum.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window