THE FRIENDS OF WALPOLE OLD CHAPEL

Charity number: 1198030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Friends of Walpole Old Chapel help to care for, maintain and develop Walpole Old Chapel, for the benefit of the general public. We also help to educate the general public about the historical and cultural significance of the chapel by opening the building to the public and by providing educational material, displays and performances

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,903
Total expenditure: £6,637

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Miriam Joan Stead Trustee 03 June 2023
EAST ANGLIAN TRADITIONAL MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
ESSEX CULTURAL DIVERSITY PROJECT LTD
Received: On time
SUFFOLK INSTITUTE OF ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY
SUFFOLK LOCAL HISTORY COUNCIL
Received: On time
Dr Paul Douglas Simmons Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Lyn Mary Banks Trustee 01 December 2021
BRAMPTON WITH STOVEN VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Dr SIMON JONATHAN WEEKS PHD Trustee 01 December 2021
HALESWORTH CAMPUS
Received: On time
THE RIFLE HALL TRUST (HALESWORTH)
Received: On time
LINDA LE VERSHA Trustee 01 December 2021
THE SOUTHWOLD AND REYDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.94k £10.90k
Total expenditure £7.78k £6.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 April 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 April 2024 84 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Oak Cottage
Halesworth Road
Walpole
Suffolk
Phone:
01986784348