POLISH UNDERGROUND MOVEMENT STUDY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Archivist relating to the Polish Underground State and the home army known as Armia Krajowa. Also education, particularly regarding WW2, awareness relating to Polish heritage and history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ealing
Governance
- 01 February 2022: CIO registration
- STUDIUM POLSKI PODZIEMNEJ (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Wojcik | Chair | 12 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Eugenia Maresch | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bartosz Karol Piasecki | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wanda Koscia | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAGDALENA SZKUTA | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF POLISH HISTORY AND CULTURE GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE STUDY OF THE POLISH UNDERGROUND MOVEMENT DURING THE OCCUPATION OF THE TERRITORY OF THE POLISH STATE BY THE ENEMIES OF POLAND DURING THE SECOND WORLD WAR; AND 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF POLISH HISTORY AND CULTURE GENERALLY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ITS PRIMARY SOURCE ARCHIVES OF POLISH HISTORY, HERITAGE AND CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 LEOPOLD ROAD
LONDON
W5 3PB
- Phone:
- 02089926057
- Email:
- studium@studium.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window