THE SPARK! SCHOOL BOOK AWARDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We believe that all children should have access to a wide range of quality literature that engages them, builds excitment in reading and represents our diverse communities. We give the children the ultimate say on who wins our awards, supported through online author events, competitions and more. We also gift books to disadvantaged children, as nominated by their teachers, so no one misses out.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 August 2022: CIO registration
- THE SPARK! BOOK AWARDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Bryan Clutterbuck | Chair | 04 August 2022 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW BROWN | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Held | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.12k | £34.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.77k | £27.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SPARK! SCHOOL BOOK AWARDS IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION READING IN SCHOOLS THROUGH A SET OF BOOK AWARDS IN BRITISH SCHOOLS WHICH: 1. INTRODUCE CHILDREN TO AN INCREASING RANGE OF NEW BOOKS AND AUTHORS 2. BUILD LINKS BETWEEN AUTHORS AND PUPILS BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR VIRTUAL AUTHOR VISITS AND OTHER CONTACTS AS APPROPRIATE 3. DEVELOP CHILDREN?S CRITICAL APPROACHES TO READING BY PROVIDING A FORUM FOR CHILDREN TO VOTE ON THEIR FAVOURITE BOOKS 4. ADMINISTER COMPETITIONS FOR CHILDREN TO MOTIVATE AND ENCOURAGE THEIR INTEREST IN READING 5. PROVIDE BOOKS FOR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN, AS IDENTIFIED BY THE SCHOOL WHERE THEY LEARN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 DENMARK ROAD
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 2SD
- Phone:
- 07849624754
- Email:
- hello@sparkbookawards.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window