METHODIST CHURCH ZIMBABWE UK FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the Christian Faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and discipline of the Methodist Church to Zimbabweans but not exclusively, in the United Kingdom, Zimbabwe or the world as the Trustees may from time to time see fit. 2. The relief of financial hardship among members of the public who are in conditions of need in the UK, Zimbabwe or the world as the Trustees from time to
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 November 2022: CIO registration
- METHODIST CHURCH ZIMBABWE FELLOWSHIP UK - MCZF UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noah Dodo | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fungai Moetsabi | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moses Ngwarati | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Revai Hilda Sona | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aquilina Dube | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Tongesai Nyengeterai Gidi | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Davison Mapfumo | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Jimmy Dube | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FORWARD MAISOKWADZO | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 283 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH TO ZIMBABWEANS BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ZIMBABWE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED IN THE UK, ZIMBABWE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT. 3. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES HELP TO FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
140B CHESTER ROAD
STREETLY
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B74 2HS
- Phone:
- 07774233453
- Email:
- mczfellowship@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window