MARIE COLVIN JOURNALISTS' NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Marie Colvin Journalists Network (MCJN) is an online community of Arab women journalists. We support each other through mentorship, professional advice, providing access to resources and opportunities, and networking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Egypt
- Iraq
- Israel
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Tunisia
- Turkey
Governance
- 28 June 2022: Standard registration
- MCJN (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY CAROLINE JANE WELLESLEY | Chair | 29 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Burr Noland Carter | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Aida Al-Kaisy | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zahera Harb | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyse Marie Doucet | Trustee | 29 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Margaret Hilsum | Trustee | 29 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.32k | £211.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.59k | £149.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 2.1.1 THE RELIEF OF NEED (INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, AMONGST WOMEN JOURNALISTS) CAUSED BY DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF SEX, FINANCIAL DISADVANTAGE OR OTHER FORM OF DISADVANTAGE; 2.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF JOURNALISM AND ITS PRACTICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIGH STANDARDS INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, MENTORING AND DEVELOPMENTAL SUPPORT; 2.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY REFERRING OR FACILITATING ACCESS TO MEDICAL SERVICES; 2.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, THE RIGHT TO FREEDOM OF EXPRESSION AND THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF WOMEN JOURNALISTS IN THE MIDDLE EAST AND NORTH AFRICA), IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Frontline Club
13 NORFOLK PLACE
LONDON
W2 1QJ
- Phone:
- 02074798960
- Email:
- info@mcjn.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window