THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF ELY

Charity number: 1202546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ely Cathedral is a Christian Church offering daily worship and a place of prayer and sanctity. It is the seat of the Bishop of Ely and the mother church of over 300 parishes that make up the Diocese of Ely. The Cathedral is also a historical monument, built to the glory of God, which welcomes thousands of pilgrims and visitors every year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ELY CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE VERY REVD MARK PHILIP JOHN BONNEY DL Chair 22 September 2012
ELY CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
Canon Timothy John Walters Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Canon Sir Jonathan Guy Jones KCB KC hon Trustee 31 October 2022
The Choral Evensong Trust
Received: On time
Canon Harriet Sarah Burles Trustee 31 October 2022
THE ASSOCIATION FOR CULTURAL EXCHANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
Canon Francis William Miles Burkitt Trustee 26 September 2022
PREP SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Canon Dr Mary Felicity Cooke Trustee 26 September 2022
TOGETHER FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, STAPLEFORD
Received: On time
The Revd Canon James Reveley Trustee 15 August 2020
ELY COMMUNITY LUNCHES
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Thomas Oliver Buchanan Trustee 26 February 2019
THE DIOCESE OF ELY RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
The Revd Canon James Garrard Trustee 29 November 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.70m
Total expenditure £5.09m
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.86m
Income - Other trading activities £2.10m
Income - Charitable activities £345.00k
Income - Endowments £50.00k
Income - Investment £394.00k
Income - Other £0
Income - Legacies £273.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.57m
Expenditure - Governance £50.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £17.00k
Expenditure - Other £50.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2023
Own use assets £806.00k
Long-term investments £17.07m
Other assets £838.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0
Total liabilities £727.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CHAPTER HOUSE
THE COLLEGE
ELY
CB7 4DL
Phone:
01353667735