SEAVIEW SAILING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Seaview Sailing Trust raises money to pay for Isle of Wight primary school children to learn how to sail free of charge. The children are taught by qualified instructors at Sea View Yacht Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 08 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREA MARIANNE JANE MINTON BEDDOES | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Alexander Hamilton Holbrook | Trustee | 17 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Conway-Hughes | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Veral Robins | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John C Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Samantha North | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Victoria Richardson | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD ROBERT BARRY | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Maxwell Garnett | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Edward Alexander Kershaw | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.28k | £252.65k | £182.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.34k | £98.09k | £130.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FROM ISLE OF WIGHT PRIMARY SCHOOLS, BY THE PROVISION OF SAILING, WATERSPORTS AND LAND-BASED ACTIVITIES, IN ORDER TO ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DEVELOPMENT, SKILLS AND SELF-CONFIDENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEA VIEW YACHT CLUB Ltd
ESPLANADE
SEAVIEW
Isle of Wight
PO34 5HB
- Phone:
- 01983613268
- Email:
- sst@svyc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window